Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Sandra A. Unsworth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra A. Unsworth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryCu - Custody (Non-Divorce) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 | Hearing |
H792 - REVIEW HEARING - CHILDREN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9372307 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-21-2022:11:00:57 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
2842 - Ord Denying Motion ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY OR VISITATION; ORDER TO PROCEED - Transaction 9372300 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-21-2022:10:59:51 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
3790 - Reply to/in Opposition REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY OR VISITATION - Transaction 9326915 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 10-24-2022:11:08:31 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
3860 - Request for Submission Transaction 9326915 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 10-24-2022:11:08:31 DOCUMENT TITLE: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY OR VISITATION FILED OCT 4, 2022 PARTY SUBMITTING: NICOLE SATHER DATE SUBMITTED: 10-24-22 SUBMITTED BY: YV DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE: |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9326997 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-24-2022:11:09:52 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service LARIN MOSS 10/24/2022 VIA EFLEX Transaction 9326915 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 10-24-2022:11:08:31 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 11/21/2022 Extra Text: Judge: SANDRA UNSWORTH |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9315049 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 10-17-2022:11:27:32 |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
2645 - Opposition to Mtn ... OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF CUSTODY OR VISITATION - Transaction 9315008 - Approved By: DCOLTRIN : 10-17-2022:11:26:48 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.