Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryDr - Criminal - Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 09/19/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8960813 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:12:04:24 |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
2991 - Ord Returning ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL JURISDICTION - Transaction 8960809 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-23-2022:12:03:44 |
|
March 21, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 03/21/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS REMOVED FROM THE MAT COURT PROGRAM; CASE RETURNED TO 1ST JDC Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 09/28/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM - COMPLETED SANCTION Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
December 06, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/06/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
November 15, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 11/15/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFT IS TO BE RELEASED ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THIS CASE TO IAP TO TRANSPORT TO THE SALVATION ARMY PROGRAM. DEFENDANT IS TO ENTER AND SUCCESSFULLY COMPLETE THE SALVATION ARMY PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
November 15, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
October 04, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 10/04/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.