Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Adult |
Last RefreshedMay 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition to Waive Accounting, Distribute Assets and Close Due to Death | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Marquis, Linda |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Death | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Errata to Removr Accounting From Record | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Care Plan Plan of Care for the Proposed Protected Adult Person |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Budget Monthly Budget |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.