Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Perry, Mary |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Divorce Decree Final |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information sheet - Domestics CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET |
|
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF RESIDENT WITNESS | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - SUMMARY DISPOSITION | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div/Ann REQUEST FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint for Divorce | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.