Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2022 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Re: Custody and Related Issues (1/2 Day)
Judge: Cutter, Nadin) Evidentiary Hearing Re: Custody and Related Issues (1/2 Day |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 36 [36] Notice of Audio/Visual Appearance |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 35 [35] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 34 [34] Order |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Notice of Motion to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, Remove Supervise visit, remove reunification, and/or Child Support
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Doc ID# 33 [33] Order sent to Mr. Toti for his signature. |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Doc ID# 32 [32] Exhibit |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Doc ID# 31 [31] File of the Motion served and open on June 6th, 2021 at 2:41 p.m |
|
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check Re: Reunification Therapy
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.