Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Elizabeth presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Elizabeth Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Blocked Account Doc ID# 4 [4] Proof of Funding Blocked Trust Account |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Court found no proof of deposit having been filed; Court ORDERED, matter continued four weeks to 08/13/21. CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via Odyssey File and Serve. - vg//7/20/21 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 3 [3] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition for the Compromise of a Minors Claim |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Doc ID# 2 [2] Order Granting Petition for The Compromise of Minor's Claim Joanna and Yudi Amezcua |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Granting Petition for the Compromise of a Minors Claim | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Compromising Minors Claim Order Granting Petition for The Compromise of Minor's Claim Joanna and Yudi Amezcua |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order regarding Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim The Court having reviewed the Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim, good cause having been shown, ORDERED petition GRANTED. Counsel DIRECTED submit an order for the compromise of the two minor s claims. CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this minute order was distributed via Odyssey File and Serve. // cbm 04/12/2021 Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Compromise of Minor's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.