Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hemet Drive Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Roger P Croteau, Esq, against Rmac Trust, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Linda Marie Bell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Marie Bell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2023 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedMarch 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated - per Secretary Judge: Chio, Danielle |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Bell, Linda Marie |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Settlement Documents
Judge: Chio, Danielle |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Secretary Judge: Chio, Danielle |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report Doc ID# 40 [40] Status Report |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order This matter having come before the Court on the Chamber Calendar, and no settlement documents having been submitted nor filed, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case shall be placed on the hearing calendar on May 16, 2023, at 9:00 a.m., and the parties are required to attend this hearing in order to explain to the Court why the Settlement Documents have not been filed. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Reina Villatoro, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /rgv 03/29/23 Judge: Chio, Danielle |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Danielle Chio Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Danielle Chio |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 39 [39] Notice of Hearing |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Doc ID# 38 [38] Notice of Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.