Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Michael Villani presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael Villani Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Pursuant To Nrcp 41 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing
Judge: Barker, David |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 22 [22] Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Doc ID# 21 [21] Substitution of Attorney |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Doc ID# 20 [20] Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Counsel Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiffs John D. Douglas, Francisco Magana and Bozhidar Mirchev Only |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Cases Reassigned from Judge Michael Villani to Vacant, DC 17 Judge: ChangeCases Reassigned from Judge Michael Villani to Vacant, DC 17 |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on Order Shortening Time set 2/1/22 per dept. No parties present. COURT ORDERED, matter OFF CALENDAR. Parties can re-notice the Motion if they wished to proceed on it. Judge: Gibbons, Mark |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on Order Shortening Time set 2/1/22 per dept. Judge: Gibbons, Mark |
|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - Set in Error Judge: Villani, Michael |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 18 [18] Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.