Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ally Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brian E. Holthus, against Reaves, Devan L., in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Eller, Crystal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEller, Crystal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryCollection Of Accounts |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Application for Writ of Possession and Show Cause Hearing Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Doc ID# 14 [14] 04/14/21 Blue Jeans Information |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 13 [13] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice Doc ID# 12 [12] Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court notes that Plaintiff s Affidavit of Service for Defendants Mckee and Reaves indicate that service was not effected until March 4th and March 10th, respectively. Due process, and to afford Defendants an opportunity to seek counsel and file an Opposition, necessitates a continuation of the hearing on Plaintiff s Application for Writ of Possession. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the aforementioned Application to Wednesday, April 14, 2021 at 9:00AM. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Haly Pannullo, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve hvp/03/15/21 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 11 [11] Affidavit/Declaration of Service Devan L. Reaves |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Affidavit/Declaration of Service Devan L. Reaves |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Doc ID# 10 [10] 03/15/21 Blue Jeans Information |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 03/15/21 Blue Jeans Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.