Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cash, Wendy, Estate Of Stephen Lyons, Lyons, Mary Ann, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Shirley Blazich, against Anderson, Clinton, Clinical Infectious Disease Specialist Itani Pc, Shah, Dhaval, M.D., Sunrise Mountainview Hospital Inc, represented by Michael E. Prangle, Robert C. Mcbride, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Delaney, Kathleen E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDelaney, Kathleen E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryMalpractice - Medical/Dental |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - FIRM JURY TRIAL - SET DURING MED. MAL. SWEEPS. Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Delaney, Kathleen E. |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Medical/Dental Malpractice
Judge: Wiese, Jerry A. |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 86 [86] Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Defendant Dhaval Shah, M.D., Clinton Anderson, PA-C and Clinical Infectious Disease Specialists (Itani) PC with Prejudice |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Appear Doc ID# 85 [85] Notice Of Intent To Appear By Audiovisual Transmission Equipment |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 84 [84] NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR ELECTRONICALLY |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Medical/Dental Malpractice Status Check Doc ID# 83 [83] Order Setting Medical/Dental Malpractice Status Check and Trial Setting Conference |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 82 [82] NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 81 [81] Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Tienchai Narach, M.D. Only |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.