Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check Deft./Petitioner MARTIN not present, in custody in the Nevada Department of Corrections (NDC). Mr. Pariente noted this case is before the Nevada State Supreme Court and requested the matter be continued six months. State had not objection and noted the Deft. is in NDC. At the request of counsel, COURT ORDERED, Matter CONTINUED. NDC 03/09/2022 9:00 AM STATUS CHECK: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS // STATUS OF DIRECT APPEAL Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vacated - per Judge Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Judge: Israel, Ronald J. |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Jurisdiction (filed Writ & Appeal) Defendant filed a Motion to Hold Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) in Abeyance on March 16, 2021. Defendant asks this Court to hold Petitioner s Writ in abeyance until the completion of his direct appeal. The Court will GRANT this Motion and hold the Writ in abeyance until the completion of Petitioner s appeal. A status check will set for September 8, 2021 at 11:00 am on status of the appeal. NDC 9/8/2021 11:00 A.M. STATUS CHECK: PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS CLERK S NOTE: Counsel are to ensure a copy of the forgoing minute order is distributed to all interested parties; additionally, a copy of the foregoing minute order was distributed to the registered service recipients via Odyssey eFileNV E-Service (4/2/2021 ks). Judge: Israel, Ronald J.) Status Check: Jurisdiction (filed Writ & Appeal |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Jurisdiction (filed Writ & Appeal)
Judge: Israel, Ronald J.) Status Check: Jurisdiction (filed Writ & Appeal |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Doc ID# 2 [2] State's Response To Petitioner's Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction Pending Appeal |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response State's Response To Petitioner's Supplemental Brief Regarding Jurisdiction Pending Appeal |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Doc ID# 1 [1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post-Conviction) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.