Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Goldman, Frederic, Goldman, Fredric, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Larson A. Welsh, against Simpson, Orenthal James, represented by Malcolm P. Lavergne, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Barisich, Veronica M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarisich, Veronica M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Doc ID# 50 [50] Judgment for costs |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Doc ID# 51 [51] Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Doc ID# 48 [48] Notice of Appeal |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Appeal Statement Doc ID# 49 [49] Case Appeal Statement |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retax Vacated - Set in Error Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 47 [47] Notice of Entry of Orders Denying and Granting |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 46 [46] Order Denying Orenthal James Simpson's Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and Order Granting Fredric Goldman's Ex Parte Application for Order Allowing Examination of Judgment Debtor |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 45 [45] Notice of Hearing |
|
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 44 [44] Notice of Hearing |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retax Doc ID# 43 [43] Plaintiff Motion to Retax Costs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.