Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Eller, Crystal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEller, Crystal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Matters |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order In efforts of Judicial Economy, the Court MOVES the time for the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss from August 3, 2021 at 10:30AM to 9:30AM. Further, 'in-person' appearance are permitted. However, parties may still elect to appear remotely via Blue Jeans (information below). Phone #: 408.419.1715 Session ID: 583 879 418 https://bluejeans.com/583879418 08/03/21 9:30 A.M. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order served to all registered parties of e-file and serve. clm 7/29/21 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint in Intervention Doc ID# 61 [61] Amended Complaint in Intervention |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure Doc ID# 62 [62] Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint in Intervention Doc ID# 60 [60] Complaint in intervention |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Vacated - On in Error Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Plaintiff Motion to Withdraw As Counsel The Court GRANTS the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as unopposed, pursuant to EDCR 2.20. However, the Court has concerns regarding the preservation of Plaintiff's rights. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to Tuesday, August 3, 2021 at 10:30AM. This is to afford Plaintiff time to retain new counsel, for said counsel to familiarize him or herself with the case, and to file a response to Defendants motion. Plaintiff's counsel shall prepare the Order and submit it pursuant to AOs 21-04 to DC19Inbox@clarkcountycourts.us within fourteen (14) calendar days. Further, counsel is directed to provide written notice to Mr. Stoekl. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Madalyn Kearney, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. /mk 6/15/21 Judge: Eller, Crystal |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Vacated |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 59 [59] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.