Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Civil Filings (Petition) case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Christy Craig presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristy Craig Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil Filings (Petition) |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decision Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Fumo stated he thought Mr. Lundy was a resident of Utah, but he was not sure, as he took over this case for Mr. Terry. Mr. Fumo stated the Deft. was seeking to be remove from the registration in Nevada. Mr. Honey stated the Deft. was not in the sex offender registration for Nevada. COURT NOTED that was an issue and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED to allow Mr. Fumo to look more closely into this matter and the pleadings filed; NOTING if he was not registered in Nevada it did not think it could rule on that matter; therefore, it needed to know if the Deft. was a resident of Utah or Nevada, and whether the Deft. was on the State of Nevada Sex Offender Registry. COURT ORDERED, RULING DEFERRED. ADDITIONALLY, as to NRS 176.490(3)(b), it needed additional information on what a sex offender needed to do and which tier it was referring to. CONTINUED TO: 5/12/21 - 8:30 AM Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decision
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decision: Petition for Release from Lifetime Supervision and For Removal From Sex Registration Requirement
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Argument: Petition for Release from Lifetime Supervision and For Removal From Sex Registration Requirement Mr. Marcello stated he took over this matter after Mr. Terry passed away. Colloquy regarding whether the attorney general (AG) had been served and the attempts to serve the AG. Mr. Honey stated he would waive service at this time to get to the merits of the case. Argument by Mr. Marcello in support of the petition. Argument by Mr. Honey in opposition. Upon Court's inquiry, Mr. Honey stated the district attorney s office would address the lifetime supervision and the AG handles the sex registration. Further argument by Mr. Marcello and Mr. Honey regarding the requirements being governed by different laws and standards. COURT NOTED it was inclined to grant the petition as it appeared the requirements under the statues were met; however, it wanted to look closer at the requirements under 176D.490 and ORDERED, matter CONTINUED for decision. CONTINUED TO: 4/28/21 - 8:30 AM Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Argument: Petition for Release from Lifetime Supervision and For Removal From Sex Registration Requirement
Judge: Craig, Christy |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 5 [5] Motion to Dismiss Petition for Removal from Sex Registration Requirement or Alternatively Opposition to Petition |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss Petition for Removal from Sex Registration Requirement or Alternatively Opposition to Petition | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition Doc ID# 4 [4] State's Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Release from Lifetime Supervision and for Removal from Sex Registration Requirement |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition State's Opposition to Petitioner's Petition for Release from Lifetime Supervision and for Removal from Sex Registration Requirement |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Hearing Doc ID# 3 [3] Notice of Change of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.