Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mcgregory, Deondra, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Nevada State Of, represented by Erica Berrett, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Ballou, Erika presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBallou, Erika Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2020 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 7 [7] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
February 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Decision and Order Doc ID# 6 [6] Decision and Order |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Vacated Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Vacated Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court GRANTS Respondent s MOTION TO DISMISS without prejudice pursuant to NRS 34.810(4) until such time as Plaintiff exhausts his administrative remedies relative to his claims. As of January 1, 2020, an inmate must first exhaust available administrative remedies before initiating a habeas petition challenging NDOC s computation of time credits pursuant to NRS 34.724 Plaintiff filed his petition after the effective date of the NRS 34.724 amendment. Further, Plaintiff fails to allege or prove that he has exhausted his administrative remedies for his time credit claims prior to filing the instant petition. Thus, this Court cannot consider the petition and Plaintiff s petition must be dismissed without prejudice. Clerk s Note: A Copy of this was e-mailed to: Allison Herr, Dag [aherr@ag.nv.gov] and Rikki Garate, DAG [rgarate@ag.nv.gov] A copy of this minute order was mailed to: A copy of this minute order was mailed to: Deondra McGregory #1230248, Florence Mcclure Women's Correctional Center, 4370 Smiley Road, Las Vegas NV 89115 (km 2/5/2021). Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 5 [5] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Hearing | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 24 Judicial Reassignment to Judge Erika D. Ballou |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 4 [4] Motion to Dismiss |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.