Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, against Wallace Todd, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse with Michael P. Vicencia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael P. Vicencia Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2017 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGovernor George Deukmejian Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Clerk |
Case Cycle Time149 days |
Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Writ filed Filed by: ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR
Date: June 07, 2018Document:Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: CLERKCLK
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Writ issued Filed by: ATTORNEY FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR
Date: November 28, 2017Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Judgment Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Summons Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Judgment Creditor
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Declaration Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Writ filed Filed by Judgment Creditor
Date: June 07, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Writ issued Filed by Judgment Creditor
Date: November 28, 2017Writ of Execution Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: March 19, 2021Case Management Statement Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Declaration Filed by CAVALRY SPV, I, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal-Partial
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Writ filed
Date: June 07, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-07-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Writ issued
Date: November 28, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.