Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Shoker, Palvir presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShoker, Palvir Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2007 | Docket Event | RETURNED NTC SARA MAE WASHBURN PEARSON FILED | |
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Special Set Hearing ORDER TO SHOW RE: DISMISSAL+ |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Special Set Hearing ORDER TO SHOW REGARDING DISMISSAL+ |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minutes & Order Filed MINUTES AND ORDER AFTER 03/01/07 HEARING FILED |
|
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail - Undeliverable NOTICE RETURNED BY POST OFFICE AS UNDELIVERABLE TOJONATHAN GRADY PEARSON. NO FORWARDING ADDRESS. |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event | F/L Case Classification | |
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Hearing on Motion (Pro Per) in Re: 000100+C/C;VISIT+0002+ |
|
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED WITH CLERK'S CERTIF OF MAIL ATTACHED | |
February 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT SERVICES APPEARANCES REPORT AND ORDER FILED W/CLERKS CERTIF OF MAILING ATTACHE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.