Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Berry, Amy J, Berry, Patrick E, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Berry, Amy J, Berry, Patrick E, represented by Thacher, Francesca J, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Shoker, Palvir presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShoker, Palvir Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2005 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMay 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 12/15/11 HEARING RE: CHILD CUSTODY, C/V %%X%% FILED. |
|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | FLOAH 12/15/11 SENT TO CLERKS OFFICE FOR FILING | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | ||
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Special Set Hearing ,PDOF C/C;VISTN;OST & T.O. GRANTED+ |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Special Set Hearing | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL OF OSC WITH TEMPORARY ORDERS ON AMY BERRY FILED; SERVED ON 11/27/11 |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing set for: MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/12 |
|
December 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing set for: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.