Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pace Supply Corp., filed a(n) 42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 0 To 10,000 case represented by Hatcher, William W., Jr, against Ckd Enterprises, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts Superior with Broderick, Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBroderick, Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
Category42: Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 0 To 10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference calendar control; default judgment to be entered by this date Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
December 02, 2021 |
Notice of Entry of Order/Ruling - judgment |
||
November 30, 2021 | Judgment - Entire Action | ||
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Broderick, Patrick |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Court Judgment | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Other Does 1-20 Only |
|
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Default Judgment | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Process Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.