Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michaud, Cynthia, Michaud, Douglas, Michaud, Kimberly, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Biedak, Esq., Frank Edward, against Borden, Timothy E, represented by Matthews, Esq., Patrick T, Romano, Esq., Thomas E, Tavares, Esq., Brian Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Renee P. Dupuis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRenee P. Dupuis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General
Date: May 21, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/21/2021
Date: May 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/31/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Comments: See (P#15) Hon. Renee P Dupuis, Presiding
Judge: Dupuis, Renee P |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for ADR Referral filed. | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking order (#15.0): ALLOWED by agreement. Referral to Court mediation to issue. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Timothy E Borden doing business as Castle Home & Title 5 Inspections's Joint Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/10/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Renee P Dupuis, Presiding
Judge: Dupuis, Renee P |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#14.0): ALLOWED by agreement. Matter to be continued to a date in July. Judge: Swanson, Dina | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Douglas Michaud, Cynthia Michaud, Kimberly Michaud's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 07/10/2023 02:00 PM Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas E Romano, Esq. added for Defendant Timothy E Borden doing business as Castle Home & Title 5 Inspections | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Referral to mediation: Attorney James McCormack |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.