Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hayes, Meghan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Newton, Esq., Michelle, against Bristow, Bette, represented by Murphy, Esq., Thomas, Peacock, Esq., Daniel E, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Susan E. Sullivan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan E. Sullivan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Meghan Hayes As Parent and Next Friend Aiden Hayes's original complaint and all rights of appeal waived. | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 07/14/2021 Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Petition for Approval of Minor Settlement (#1.0): ALLOWED After hearing, I find the proposed settlement to be fair and reasonable, given the nature of the injuries and the minor plaintiff's recovery from those injuries. I find that the plaintiff, Meghan Hayes understands the finality of the settlement, as well as her obligation to hold and manage the funds for the sole benefit of her son. Settlement is APPROVED. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Proposed Settlement scheduled on: 06/09/2021 11:00 AM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Hon. Susan E Sullivan, Presiding Appeared: Defendant Bette Bristow Daniel E Peacock, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Jennifer A Sullivan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter
Judge: Sullivan, Susan E |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 05/24/2021 11:38:51 Notice Sent To: Michelle Newton, Esq. Jason Stone Injury Lawyers 225 Friend St Suite 102, Boston, MA 02114 Notice Sent To: Thomas Murphy, Esq. Lynch and Lynch, PC 45 Bristol Drive, South Easton, MA 02375 Notice Sent To: Daniel E Peacock, Esq. Lynch and Lynch 45 Bristol Drive, South Easton, MA 02375 | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Joint Petition of the Parties for Approval of the Settlement with a Minor Pursuant to M.G.L. c. 231 § 140C½; Memorandum in Support of the Joint Petition of the Parties for Approval of the Settlement with a Minor Pursuant to M.G.L. c. 231 § 140C½ filed. | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/21/2021 | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Daniel E Peacock, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Bette Bristow | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas Murphy, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Bette Bristow |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.