Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Monte, Ana, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Mitchell, Esq., John Robert, against Monte, David, Monte, Joaquim, Sousa, Antonio M, represented by Burke, Esq., Matthew Francis, Killoran, Esq., Thomas P, Medeiros, Esq., Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas J. Perrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Perrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Answer to original complaint
Date: December 15, 2021Endorsement on Motion to continue (#17.0): DENIED Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E
Date: June 27, 2023Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: March 14, 2023Answer to original complaint Applies To: Sousa, Antonio M (Defendant)
Date: March 14, 2023Plaintiff Ana Monte's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event
Date: December 12, 2022Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: June 15, 2022Plaintiff Ana Monte's Assented to Motion to Continue
Date: November 01, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 21, 2021Plaintiff(s) Ana Monte's EX PARTE Motion for a Preliminary Injunction
Date: May 21, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/21/2021
Date: May 21, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Status Review scheduled on: 09/20/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Elaine M Buckley, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff John Robert Mitchell, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Jeffrey P Medeiros, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Thomas P Killoran, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate 09/20/2023 02:00 PM Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter 09/20/2023 02:00 PM
Judge: Buckley, Elaine M |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Antonio M Sousa's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 06/28/2023 02:00 PM Conference to Review Status | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue (#17.0): DENIED Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend tracking deadline(s) (#18.0): ALLOWED Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Antonio M Sousa's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 06/28/2023 02:00 PM Conference to Review Status | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 06/28/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Susan E Sullivan, Presiding Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter
Judge: Sullivan, Susan E |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 03/15/2023 10:57:18 | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 03/16/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Thomas J Perrino, Presiding Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter
Judge: Perrino, Thomas J |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jeffrey P Medeiros, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Antonio M Sousa | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se dismissed/withdrawn as Self Represented for Defendant Antonio M Sousa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.