Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Frade, Kristi, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Shea, Esq., Michael Owen, against Luxottica Of America, Inc, represented by Melnick, Esq., Stephen T, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 20, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/20/2021
Date: May 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to the United States District Court filed by Applies To: Luxottica of America, Inc (Defendant) | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Stephen T Melnick, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Luxottica of America, Inc | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Luxottica of America, Inc: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/20/2021 | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Early Case Management Conference Pilot Program. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.