Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Morin, Kathy, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Bennett, Esq., Richard M, against Dallen, John, Delsalvatore, Amy, Doyle, Daniel, Galary, Jake, Hayworth, Geoffrey, (total of 9) See All represented by Koldys, Esq., Gregory J, Petrini, Esq., Christopher J, Terry, Esq., Michael K, White, Esq., Heather Colleen, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Renee P. Dupuis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRenee P. Dupuis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 18, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 18, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 05/18/2021
Date: May 18, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Submission of Status Report of Defendant Fairhaven Conservation Commission on remand (#26.0): Other action taken In accord with this Court's Order of 9/22/23 (Docket Entry No. 25) the parties shall file briefs on or before 12/22/23. Judge: Sullivan, Hon. Susan E | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendants Geoffrey Hayworth Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, Daniel Doyle Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, Amy Delsalvatore Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, Gary Lavalette Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, Corey Pietraszek Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, John Dallen Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission, Jake Galary Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission's Submission of Status Report of Defendants on Remand | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Further Order on Remand Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Judgment on Pleading scheduled on: 05/11/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Raffi N Yessayan, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Richard M Bennett, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Michael K Terry, Esq., Defendant Gregory J Koldys, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Dina Swanson, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi N |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael K Terry, Esq. added for Defendants Members of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief filed: of the Plaintiff Kathy Morin filed pursuant to Court's remand order Applies To: Morin, Kathy (Plaintiff) | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to file late brief per court order (#22.0): ALLOWED by agreement. | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kathy Morin's Assented to Motion to file a late brief per court order | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief filed: of Defendant Fairhaven Conservation Commission, on remand Applies To: White, Esq., Heather Colleen (Attorney) on behalf of Daniel Doyle Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission (Defendant); Petrini, Esq., Christopher J (Attorney) on behalf of Daniel Doyle Member of The Fairhaven Conservation Commission (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.