Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barbic, Jennifer, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Salguero, Walter, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Cory J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2010 | Hearing | Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney | |
May 05, 2010 | Hearing |
Proof of Service by mail |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail |
|
April 27, 2010 | Hearing |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $1.50 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 14786. Receipt #520130 for amount of $1.50. |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 Amount of $1.50 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 14786. Receipt #520130 for amount of $1.50. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Hearing |
839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 Amount of $4.00 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 3553413. Receipt #513012 for amount of $24.00. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Hearing |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 3553413. Receipt #513012 for amount of $24.00. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
839 Pmt: Fax Filing Fees CRC 2006 Amount of $4.00 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 3553413. Receipt #513012 for amount of $24.00. |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
185C Pmt: Request, App, Stip, Motion, or Notice of Amount of $20.00 for BARBIC, JENNIFER (PE-1). Received from JENNIFER BARBIC, check no(s) 3553413. Receipt #513012 for amount of $24.00. |
|
March 15, 2010 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order RE RESTRAINING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.