Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Faglie, Kristyn Marie, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Faglie, Michael Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Cory J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2009 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Without Minor Children |
Time To Trial259 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions339 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time1588 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2014 | Hearing |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $30.00 for FAGLIE, KRISTYN MARIE (PE-1). Received from MARIE FAGLIE. Receipt #776709 for amount of $30.00. Detail: 50.00 CHANGE: 10 X 2. |
|
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
180B Pmt: Certified Copy of Paper, Record or Proceeding on Amount of $30.00 for FAGLIE, KRISTYN MARIE (PE-1). Received from MARIE FAGLIE. Receipt #776709 for amount of $30.00. Detail: 50.00 CHANGE: 10 X 2. |
|
February 28, 2013 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney PETITIONER |
|
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney PETITIONER |
|
January 31, 2013 | Hearing |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney Document Image |
|
January 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney Document Image |
|
January 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL |
|
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAIL |
|
January 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment RESERVED JUDGMENT |
|
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment RESERVED JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.