Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sloan, Joseph, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Chavoya, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoodward, Cory J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management36 days |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2008 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause New Calendar |
|
February 27, 2008 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
February 06, 2008 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause New Notice |
|
February 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause New Notice |
|
February 05, 2008 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS THE CLERK TO ISSUE AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TO SHOW WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR OTHER SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 2/28/2008 AT 1:30 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CASUE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
February 05, 2008 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
February 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference 1/24/08 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO MARIA SHAVOYA AND ANY AND AL OCCUPANTS WAITING ON JUDGMENT Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS THE CLERK TO ISSUE AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TO SHOW WHY THE CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR OTHER SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. UPON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 2/28/2008 AT 1:30 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR ORDER TO SHOW CASUE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. NOTICE TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.