Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tryk, Loftes, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Brar, Gurpreet, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Pulskamp, Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulskamp, Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims - 1,501 To 5,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Matter TypeJudgment |
Small Claims Trial
Date: September 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
September 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Small Claims Trial PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial 09/12/2019 Small Claims Trial PROOF OF SERVICE FILED Judge: Pulskamp, Gregory |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties (Small Claims) |
|
September 10, 2019 | Hearing | Court Interpreter Services - CV | |
August 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Proof of Service PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO GURPREET BRAR |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO GURPREET BRAR |
|
July 22, 2019 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents | |
July 22, 2019 | Hearing | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.