Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guzman Alicia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Guzman Salvador, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 25, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions34 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time148 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia, and respondent ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia - Granted on 2014-08-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default or Uncontested Judgment FL230 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SEE ATTACHED SJE REJECT LETTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SEE ATTACHE SJE REJECT LETTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (and waiver of final declaration - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SEE ATTACHED SJE REJECT LETTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
May 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SEE ATTACHED SJE REJECT LETTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (SEE ATTACHED SJE REJECT LETTER - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Guzman, Alicia ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.