Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Janella Hardin, Hardin Janella, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Aaron Hardin, Hardin Aaron, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Defendant/Respondent
Date: March 23, 2022Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: May 25, 2021Motion Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: May 04, 2022Amended Answer Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: March 23, 2022Parenting Plan Prepared By One Party
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: March 25, 2022Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00DR3118
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00298 Petition Filed - Defendant/Respondent
Date: March 23, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: March 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.