Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Roman Janet, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by 28 N Clark St, , Chicago Il, 60602, States Atty Child Support, against Hart Perry, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryForeign Judgment - Outside Illinois - Dhfs |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Exhibits Filed
Date: February 23, 2021Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: April 29, 2021Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Pet To Register Foreign Judgment - Dhfs
Date: February 23, 2021Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: September 21, 2021New Case Filing
Date: February 23, 2021Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: April 01, 2021Petition For Issuance Of Rule (To Show Cause) Filed
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBITS FILED
Date: February 23, 2021PET TO REGISTER FOREIGN JUDGMENT - DHFS
Date: February 23, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.