Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Peralta Jorge, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case represented by 6232 N Pulaski#200, , Chicago Il, 60646, Consumer Law Group Llc, against Sanchez Blanca, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities - Cs |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Petition For Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities - CS
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Affidavit As To Military Service Filed
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: June 15, 2021Consolidate - Allowed -
Date: August 10, 2021Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Mot/Pet For Temp/Allocation Of Parental Responsibilities
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Alias Summons - Issued - Paid
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Petition Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Scheduled Date
Date: June 18, 2021Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: December 07, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Case Set On Progress Call
Date: December 07, 2022PETITION FOR ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES - CS
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00MOT/PET FOR TEMP/ALLOCATION OF PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITIES
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.