Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hfs Illinois, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by 28 N Clark St, , Chicago Il, 60602, States Atty Child Support, against Thomas Deontrae, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Administrative Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Issue Of Insurance - Reserved -
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Voluntary Acknowledgment Of Paternity - Filed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Rule To Show Cause Be Issued - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Pet For Admin Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Held In Contempt Of Court - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Petition For Issuance Of Rule (To Show Cause) Filed
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-06-25T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Off Call
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Held In Contempt Of Court - Continued
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Held In Contempt Of Court - Continued
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: October 02, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Order For Turnover Of Funds - Allowed -
Date: July 31, 2023Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: June 12, 2023Held In Contempt Of Court - Continued
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Held In Contempt Of Court - Continued
Date: October 02, 2023Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: June 12, 2023Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: July 31, 2023Held In Contempt Of Court - Continued
Date: July 31, 2023Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: October 02, 2023Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: June 12, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2023-05-05T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00VOLUNTARY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY - FILED -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00PET FOR ADMIN DECLARATION OF PARENTAGE - DHFS
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.