Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pedraza Leslie, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by 28 N Clark St, , Chicago Il, 60602, States Atty Child Support, against Villegas Carlos, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Administrative Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Pet For Admin Declaration Of Parentage - Dhfs
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons - Retd P.S.
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Emergency Order Of Protection - Denied
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Voluntary Acknowledgment Of Paternity - Filed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Scheduled Date
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Petitioner Referred To Parenting Education - Allowed
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Order Referral Marriage & Family Counseling Services - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Petition For Order Of Protection Continued For Hearing - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Respondent Referred To Parenting Education - Allowed
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Call
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Order For Child Support - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Child Representative
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Appoint Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Appoint Atty, Child Rep, Gal, Trustee Or Exec. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Order Support Payments Direct To C.C.C./S.D.U. - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Affidavit/Proof Of Service For Notice To Withhold
Date: 2021-11-25T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Emergency Motion/Petition Filed
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2022-02-07T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Emergency Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00OP - Visitation - Denied -
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Case Assigned to Zoom Hearing - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Petition For Temp Protection Order
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Issue Alias Summons - Allowed -
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00OP - Physical Possession Of Children To Petitioner
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Alias Summons - Issued - Paid
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Order Of Protection - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00OP: Respondent Served In Open Court - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Remanded To Department Of Corrections - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Subpoena - Retd P.S.
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2022-07-13T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Release From Law Enforcement Custody - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Quash Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Order Of Protection - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-20T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-06-21T00:00:00Produce Exhibits Or Other Records Or Documents Or Person - Allowed -
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Release From Law Enforcement Custody - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Remanded To Department Of Corrections - Allowed -
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Affidavit Filed
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2022-12-21T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Continued
Date: February 15, 2023Subpoena - Retd P.S.
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Notice To Produce Filed
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Order Of Protection Ex.Parte - Extended - Allowed -
Date: February 15, 2023Strike Future Court Date
Date: February 15, 2023Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: March 01, 2023Strike Future Court Date
Date: March 01, 2023Terminate Order Of Protection - Allowed
Date: March 01, 2023OP: Respondent Served In Open Court - Allowed -
Date: February 15, 2023Case Off Call
Date: March 01, 2023VOLUNTARY ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PATERNITY - FILED -
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00PET FOR ADMIN DECLARATION OF PARENTAGE - DHFS
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.