Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Murphy Jr Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Murphy Datrese, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Grace G. Dickler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGrace G. Dickler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryJoint Pet For Simplified Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: April 13, 2021CASE ASSIGNED TO POST-DECREE CALENDAR
Date: May 19, 2021E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: April 12, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: May 03, 2021SCHEDULED DATE
Date: May 03, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021MARRIAGE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: May 03, 2021E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: May 03, 2021ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: April 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00JOINT PET FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CASE SCHEDULED FOR PROVE UP ON CALENDAR
Date: April 13, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.