Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson Elsy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Johnson David, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Mark J. Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark J. Lopez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: April 12, 2021E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: April 23, 2021MARRIAGE
Date: April 12, 2021LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: May 26, 2021CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: May 07, 2021298 PETITION FILED - PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER
Date: April 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: April 28, 2021298 PETITION PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER - 100% GRANTED/ALLOWED
Date: April 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: April 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.