Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tanisha Clark, Clark Tanisha L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Gene Seals, Seals Jr Gene, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Alias Summons - Issued - Paid
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Summons - Retd - Substitute Service
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Case Scheduled For Prove Up On Calendar
Date: June 11, 2021Order Leave To File -Report Of Proceedings Within 28 Days - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Judgment
Date: June 25, 2021Parties Have Not Previously Filed For Divorce
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Action Does Not Involve Minor Child/Children
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate & Motion For Default Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Report Or Record Of Proceedings Filed
Date: July 20, 2021E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Default - Allowed -
Date: June 25, 2021Motion Filed
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Case Assigned To Post-Decree Calendar
Date: June 25, 2021Alias Summons - Retd N.S.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00E-Filing Exemption - Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Marriage
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Summons Issued And Returnable
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00MARRIAGE
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION FILED
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00ACTION DOES NOT INVOLVE MINOR CHILD/CHILDREN
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00E-FILING EXEMPTION - FILED
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00PARTIES HAVE NOT PREVIOUSLY FILED FOR DIVORCE
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.