Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jolie Tripoli, Tripoli Jolie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by , Bedford Par Il, 60499, 6801 W 73Rd St #1337, Urbanik Ashley M, against Patrick Tripoli, Tripoli Patrick, represented by , Chicago Il, 60654, 321 N Clark St Ste 1, Schiller Ducanto & Fleckl, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Boyd, William S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBoyd, William S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2023 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Completion Of Minor Children Parenting Education/ Petitioner - Filed -
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate Of Service Filed
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Petition For Temp Child Support
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Petition For Dissolution Of
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Petition Filed
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: November 04, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: July 19, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: February 07, 2023Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: September 20, 2022Order Change Of Venue By Right - Allowed
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: May 19, 2022Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Case Set On Pre-Trial Call
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Case Set On Progress Call
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Order Parenting Time To Respondent - Allowed -
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Return To Preliminary Judge
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Certificate Of Dissolution Filed
Date: March 15, 2023Case Set On Progress Call
Date: December 22, 2022Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Stipulation To Hear Uncontested Cause Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Stipulation To Hear Uncontested Cause Filed
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Completion Of Minor Children Parenting Education/ Respondent - Filed -
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00PETITION FOR TEMP CHILD SUPPORT
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00COMPLETION OF MINOR CHILDREN PARENTING EDUCATION/ PETITIONER - FILED -
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00PETITION FILED
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.