Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Thomas Joseph, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by 10129 S Western Ave, , Arends Callahan, Chicago Il, 60643, against Mcduffie Daniel, Unknown Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with James P. Flannery, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Flannery, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract - Non-Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Postcard Generated
Date: July 09, 2021Refile As New Case
Date: April 12, 2021New Case Filing
Date: April 12, 2021Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: April 12, 2021Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: December 15, 2021Case Set On Status Call
Date: April 12, 2021Order Case Disposed
Date: December 27, 2021Contract Complaint Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: April 12, 2021Case Set On Individual Calendar
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00REFILE AS NEW CASE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: July 09, 2021CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.