Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mcgivern Sharann, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by , Chicago Il, 60661, 218 N Jefferson 401, Sherwood Law Group Llc, against Lozano Nicholas, Lozano Marilyn, Ferry Ericson, Ferry Eric, represented by , Chicago Il, 60602, 120 N Lasalle #2600, Querrey Harrow Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with James P. Flannery, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P. Flannery, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: April 30, 2021OTHER PERSONAL INJURY COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00CASE RERANDOMIZED TO MOTION CALL
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: July 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: July 07, 2021COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY DEPOSITION FILED
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE FILED
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED
Date: April 30, 2021REFILE AS NEW CASE
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: April 30, 2021ANSWER FILED
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: April 30, 2021CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.