Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Limited Civil case represented by Raymond A. Patenaude, against Jitesh Sen, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Synchrony Bank against Jitesh Sen, also known as Jitesh K Sen, and Does 1 through 15. The jurisdiction of the case is a limited civil case, with the amount demanded not exceeding $10,000. The complaint alleges causes of action for breach of contract and common counts.
The complaint states that Synchrony Bank is a national banking association organized under the laws of the United States of America. The true names of the defendants sued as Does are unknown to the plaintiff. The complaint also mentions that before commencing this action, Synchrony Bank informed the defendant(s) in writing of its intention to file the action.
The plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit, damages of $5,538.14, interest on the damages, attorney's fees, and any other relief that the court deems just and fair.
Note: No specific violation of statutes is mentioned in this document.
Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 106
Date: May 10, 2021Limited Collections Order
Date: May 05, 2021Proposed Judgment Request|
Date: March 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Default and Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) As to Jitesh Sen Entered Ruling |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Entry |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Court Judgment Ruling |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 106 ScheduleHearing |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Compliance Hearing 08/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 512 ScheduleHearing |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Limited Collections Order Ruling |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Request| ZZZ005 |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Costs Request| DCL047 |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: Does Request| REQ051 |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Request| DCL041 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.