We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mehrok Vs Patterson

Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago

Mehrok, Kalwant, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Morry, John, Patterson, Donny, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

July 13, 2012

Last Refreshed

February 23, 2021

Filing Location

Alameda County, CA

Category

Unlawful Detainer

Practice Area

Property

Matter Type

Unlawful Detainer

Case Cycle Time

109 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

53 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Documents

Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed

Date: 2012-07-13T00:00:00

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Date: 2012-09-04T00:00:00

Judgment Entered

Date: September 21, 2012

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Writ of Possession - Satisfied Filed
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment

Judge: Winifred Y. Smith

Docket Event Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Denied
Docket Event Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed
Docket Event Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Hearing Confirmed for 10/25/2012 01:30 PM D-
Docket Event Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Filed for Debtor
Docket Event Writ of Possession Issued
Complaint Unlawful Detainer

Judge: Winifred Y. Smith

Docket Event Judgment Entered
Docket Event Unlawful Detainer Judgment for Plaintiff
See all events