Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Robert Alan Ferguson, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case against Fernanda Miguel Eaton, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 12, 2006 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by Robert Alan Ferguson against Fernanda Miguel Eaton and Does 1-10. The complaint alleges general negligence and seeks damages for personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death. The jurisdiction of the case is an unlimited civil case in Alameda County. The amount of damages is not specified in the complaint.
There are no specific violations of statutes mentioned in the complaint. The complaint consists of multiple pages, but only the first three pages are provided in the text. The dollar amounts demanded or available are not mentioned in the provided text.
Case Management Statement of Robert Alan Ferguson Filed
Date: August 09, 2007Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 12, 2007Rejection Letter Issued on Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Unlimited Paper File Verified and Destroyed Filing |
|
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered Ruling |
|
August 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed Filing |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement of Robert Alan Ferguson Filed Filing |
|
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rejection Letter Issued on Case Management Statement Issue |
|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed Filing |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued to Case Management Conf Continuance dept: 520 date: 09/05/2007 time: 09:00 AM ScheduleHearing |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes DSM001 |
|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued Hearing |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conf Continuance 07/11/2007 09:00 AM D- 520 ScheduleHearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.