Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
The Hartford, filed a(n) Unlimited Civil case represented by Gary A. Rosenberg, against Arescom, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Jayne Loughry, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2005 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by The Hartford against Arescom Inc. and Does 1 to 100. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including breach of contract, indebitatus assumpsit, account stated, open book account, and quantum meruit. The demand in this case exceeds $10,000. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants breached a written agreement for the purchase of goods and/or services by failing to pay all sums due. The plaintiff has made repeated demands for payment, but the defendants have refused to perform their obligations. The plaintiff seeks the unpaid sum of $61,381.00, with interest at the highest legal rate since February 6, 2004. The plaintiff also claims entitlement to attorney fees in the additional sum of $660.00.
Note: No violation of statutes is mentioned in this document.
Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed
Date: April 03, 2006Order re Case Management Filed
Date: March 24, 2006Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes
Date: March 24, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Unlimited Paper File Verified and Destroyed Filing |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail: Minute Order Filed Filing |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered Ruling |
|
April 03, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed Filing |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order re Case Management Filed Filing |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by Mail - Minutes DSM001 |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing Continued to Case Management Conf Continuance dept: 510 date: 05/26/2006 time: 08:30 AM ScheduleHearing |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued Hearing |
|
March 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Stay of Proceedings Filed Filing |
|
January 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order re Case Management Filed Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.