Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Patelco Credit Union, filed a(n) Limited Civil case represented by Thomas Caudill, against Tishian Marie Salas, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2003 |
CategoryLimited Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
|
This complaint is filed by Patelco Credit Union against Tishian Marie Salas and other unknown defendants. The complaint alleges breach of contract and common counts. Patelco Credit Union is an insured lending institution based in San Francisco, California. Tishian Marie Salas is an individual residing in Hayward, Alameda County, California. The contract giving rise to this action was entered into and performed in Hayward.
The complaint states that the defendants, including Tishian Marie Salas, were agents and employees of each other and were acting within the course and scope of their agency and employment. Patelco Credit Union claims that Tishian Marie Salas breached the monthly payments due under the loan agreement and has refused to make said payment despite demand from the plaintiff. As a result, Patelco Credit Union has declared the entire unpaid principal balance of $13,545.62 due and payable, along with interest charges at the contractual rate of 15.9% per annum and attorney's fees and costs for collection of delinquent sums.
The complaint also includes two additional causes of action, both alleging that Tishian Marie Salas became indebted to Patelco Credit Union for the agreed sum of $13,545.62 and has failed to make payment despite demand. The complaint seeks judgment against Tishian Marie Salas for the principal sum, accumulated interest charges, attorney's fees, costs of suit, and any other relief deemed just and proper by the court.
Note: No dollar amounts other than the principal sum of $13,545.62 are mentioned in the complaint.
Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Tishian Marie Salas
Date: June 15, 2005Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Bankruptcy
Date: May 25, 2005Order of Examination 05/20/2005 09:00 AM D- 504
Date: April 15, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Paper File Destroyed Filing |
|
June 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution - Partially Satisfied from Alameda Filed Filing |
|
June 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Tishian Marie Salas Filing |
|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Rejection Letter Issued on Notice of Bankruptcy Issue |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
OEX - Dropped - Neither Side Appearing Hearing |
|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed Filing |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Civil Order of Examination Issued Issue |
|
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination 05/20/2005 09:00 AM D- 504 ScheduleHearing |
|
October 20, 2003 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Issued Issue |
|
October 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued To Alameda Issue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.