Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Taylor, Gladston Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Jia, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Somnath Raj Chatterjee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSomnath Raj Chatterjee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
December 01, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
November 01, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order Family Law Hearing |
||
October 27, 2021 |
Judge: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage |
||
October 21, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re:... |
||
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Rejection Letter Issued on Order to Show Cause and Affidavit for Contempt | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Reset to Family Law Long-Cause Hearing 10/27/2021 02:00 PM D- 507 | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Law Long-Cause Hearing Commenced and Continued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.