Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Armando Fernando Velazquez Baez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fabiola Abigail Arias Simancas, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Wendy McGuire Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy McGuire Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2026 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION/DECLARATION TO PUBLISH SUMMONS FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PUBLICATION FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
FEE RECEIVED FOR PUBLICATION REQUEST FROM ARMANDO FERNANDO VELAZQUEZ BAEZ Not Applicable |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/09/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/07/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17
Judge: Wendy McGuire Coats |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.