Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Louis A Bryson Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Archella M Morris, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with John William Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn William Kennedy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 10, 2013 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions249 days |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CHECK FOR 1-YEAR JUVENILE C/V EXPIRATION DATE | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
5CLK CALENDARED ON 08/15/19 IN DEPT. 05. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/15/19 IN DEPT. 24. Not Applicable Judge: John William Kennedy |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL: CUSTODY ORDER/FINAL JUDGMENT TO SAVANNAH BRYSON NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 8/15/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 05
Judge: Rebecca C. Hardie |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUVENILE CUSTODY ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) FILED WITH CLRKS CERT OF MAILING TO PARTIES, JUVENILE CASE # J17-00983 SAVANNAH DESIREE BRYSON FROM CC Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
LOUIS AUGUSTUS BRYSON IV ADDED AS A PARTY Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
SAVANNAH DESIREE BRYSON ADDED AS A PARTY Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE /CORRECT OF PARTY ARCHELLA M MORRIS Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/10/2013 OF LOUIS BRYSON AS TO DEF/X-DFT ARCHELLA M MORRIS, ARCHELLA M BRYSON ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL Not Applicable |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUVENILE CUSTODY ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) FILED WITH CLRKS CERT OF MAILING TO PARTIES, JUVENILE CASE # J17-00985 FROM CC Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.