Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rahimi, Storay, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Ameri, Sahar, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED SAHAR AMERI WITH MC-030 DECLARARTION ON 6/28/2022 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration FILED BY PETITIONER |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed RESPONDENT'S WITNESS LIST |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail (CLETS) (DV Prev) SERVED STORAY RAHIMI BY MAIL WITH RESPONSE ON 6/20/22 FILED BY RESP |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee TO REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED SAHAR AMERI WITH ATTACHED DECLARATION MC-31; ATTACHMENTS EXHIBITS; NOTICE OF COURT HEARING ELDER ABUSE; REQUEST FOR ORDER TO STOP ELDER ABUSE; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ORDERS TO STOP ELDER ABUSE; TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON 6/14/22 |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) ON 6/29/2022 AT 9AM IN D3 |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment JUDGE RICHARDSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.