Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Torres, Sonia, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Penunuri, Marcellino Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Richardson, Paul K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichardson, Paul K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PERSONALLY SERVED MARCELLINO RICARDO PENUNURI WITH REQ FOR DVRO, TEMPORARY DVRO, NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/06/2022 |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) SERVED MARCELLINO RICARDO PENUNURI ON 6/07/22 WITH NOT OF HEARING, DV-100, TRO DV-110. |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) AMENDED |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) AMENDED |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE FOR REVIEW ON AMENDED REQUEST |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order AMENDED |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) | |
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE RICHARDSON FOR REVIEW ON DVRO |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.